SOLVE IT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOLVE IT provides a free service to children, young people, parents, carers and those affected by Volatile Substance Abuse. It promotes a general awareness to the consequences of this type of substance abuse and works towards the prevention of related deaths, illness, accidents, crime, and social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 April 2002: Standard registration
- 16 September 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 16 September 2010: Funds transferred to 1123065 SOLVE IT VSA
- PREVENTION THROUGH EDUCATION (Working name)
- VOLATILE SUBSTANCE ABUSE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/05/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.84k | £195.87k | £218.08k | £233.53k | £166.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.67k | £164.25k | £242.51k | £205.18k | £218.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 14 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 27 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 02 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 22 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 27 November 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 3 APRIL 2002 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARENTS/ADULTS, GUARDIANS, AND CARERS IN THE CONSEQUENCES OF VOLATILE SUBSTANCE ABUSE, ("V.S.A.") WITH THE INTENTION OF PREVENTING RELATED DEATHS, ILLNESS ACCIDENTS AND CRIME. B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARENTS /ADULTS, GUARDIANS, CARERS AND ALL THOSE AFFECTED BY VOLATILE SUBSTANCE ABUSE,("V.S.A."), THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SUCH THINGS AS FREE ADVICE (ONE TO ONE AND TELEPHONE), SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING SERVICES.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window