DOWN SYNDROME INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support networks and assistance to people with Down syndrome and those who live and work with them throughout the world. Committed to ensuring quality of life and human rights for all people with Down syndrome worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Argentina
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Charchuk | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angus Graham | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ana Lucia Arellano Barba | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JESSAMY TANG | Trustee | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr RHONDA FARAGHER | Trustee | 18 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BOYS | Trustee | 18 August 2009 |
|
|||||
BRIDGET SNEDDEN | Trustee | 22 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA DOS SANTOS | Trustee | 15 April 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.04k | £411.85k | £413.57k | £316.81k | £422.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.60k | £382.29k | £359.48k | £402.76k | £397.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2014 as amended on 01 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE WITH DOWN SYNDROME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND RESOURCES TO PEOPLE WITH DOWN SYNDROME, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND THE PROFESSIONALS WHO WORK WITH THEM WITH SPECIFIC FOCUS ON DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; AND 2) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN CONNECTION WITH DOWN SYNDROME AND OTHER LEARNING DISABILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANGDON DOWN CENTRE
2A LANGDON PARK
TEDDINGTON
MIDDLESEX
TW11 9PS
- Phone:
- 01395493108
- Email:
- contact@ds-int.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window