MILTON KEYNES FAMILY MEDIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provision of mediation and other related services (eg counselling) to people; including parents, children, grandparents affected by divorce separation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £37,168 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- MILTON KEYNES FAMILY MEDIATION SERVICE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Anthony Bowler | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Reginald Hazlegrove | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.69k | £138.41k | £130.17k | £134.39k | £249.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.76k | £154.59k | £144.53k | £139.76k | £245.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £101.68k | £87.27k | £95.88k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH FEBRUARY 2001 as amended on 08 Sep 2021 as amended on 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, 1. To provide assistance through services directed to mediation, conciliation or reconciliation for: a. couples whose relationships appear to be breaking down whereas such relationships have already-broken down, to advise and help in the settlement of differences or potential differences over associated matters such as residence of, and contact with, the children and financial matters; b. persons, organisations, authorities or groups involved or likely to become involved in dispute or inter-personal conflict. 2. The preservation, protection and improvement of mental and emotional health of people living in the Milton Keynes area and across the United Kingdom suffering from mental illness, depression, anxiety, addiction, loss, bereavement and abuse by providing access to therapists and therapy programmes, including but not limited to Mental Health, Addiction, Anger Management, Anxiety & Stress, Parental Alienation & Abuse, and therapy programmes tailored to Black and Ethnic Minority Communities and LGBT+ groups. 3. The advancement of mediation and therapeutic training and education by defining, developing and providing relevant training programmes to people over the age of 16 years in the home counties and across the United Kingdom in such ways as the charity trustees think fit.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACORN HOUSE
371 MIDSUMMER BOULEVARD
CENTRAL MILTON KEYNES
MK9 3HP
- Phone:
- 01908231293
- Email:
- enquiries@mediationmk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window