Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1089823
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2008 30 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 May 2008 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 13 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 26 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 06 December 2004 On Time