Financial history HAPPY TOTS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1089978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £314.51k £310.63k £309.45k £303.21k £212.08k
Total expenditure £279.85k £283.71k £325.81k £320.55k £242.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £278.33k £2.77k £2.00k £3.00k N/A