Financial history CANCER CARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1089803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.31k £7.17k £1.02k £68 £4.47k
Total expenditure £174 £25.00k £0 £50.00k £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A