Financial history FRIENDSHIP CLUB (CHADDERTON)

Charity number: 1091584
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £12.62k £10.35k £7.70k £8.65k £8.34k
Total expenditure £10.55k £10.95k £8.37k £8.73k £8.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A