FRIENDS OF NEWBURN MANOR NURSERY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wrap around care for children between the ages of 3 years to 14 years both before school and after school. a wide varierty of activities are avaible to the children with a healthy snack. The club celerbrates different relgious celeabrations through play and food. The Manor is Based in Newburn within a nursery which is situated a rural area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 07 March 2002: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.97k | £34.30k | £21.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.99k | £35.35k | £22.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 23 June 2009 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 28 June 2007 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 28 June 2007 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED 19 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT , ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF NEWBURN MANOR NURSERY SCHOOL IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window