Accounts and annual returns IMAMIA MUSLIM SOCIETY OF HUSSAINI MISSION

Charity number: 1091165
Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 22 September 2022 598 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 22 September 2022 598 days late Download Open in new window