THE COURTHOUSE PROJECT (OTLEY) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Courthouse Project runs a fully accessible arts and resource centre in Otley where people of all ages take part in arts educational, heritage and voluntary sector activities inc. music/theatre/dance/visual arts workshops, rehearsals, classes, training, meetings and performances; digital media, exhibitions and visual arts/crafts activities. It supports 135 volunteers who help run the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
97 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 March 2002: Standard registration
- OTLEY COURT HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Nigel Wellbrook | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Fidler | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pelle Langli | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baskerville | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Earle | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pam Maureen Lamming | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH SEYMOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS GILL LEGGAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.39k | £164.54k | £231.00k | £296.69k | £306.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271.66k | £129.15k | £226.28k | £296.07k | £307.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.99k | £91.64k | £36.15k | £17.18k | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 25 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF OTLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY VISUAL ARTS, MUSIC, THEATRE, DANCE AND LITERATURE. B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OTLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
OTLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Otley Courthouse
Courthouse Street
Otley
LS21 3AN
- Phone:
- 01943467216
- Email:
- admin@otleycourthouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window