THE FRIENDS OF BRUCE CASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The friends of Bruce Castle provides volunteers to help at events and functions, we assist the museum to raise funds for specific projects, we publicise the work of the museum and its history and educate the public about the building's significance. We also raise our own funds in order to be able to help the museum to purchase small artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Haringey
Governance
- 16 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH MORRISON NICHOLAS | Chair | 30 October 2002 |
|
|
||||
Stephen King | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Bradley | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hebbs | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL MACDONALD | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE PROTZ | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE TOWERS | Trustee | 27 October 2003 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE SUSAN CROSBY | Trustee | 30 October 2001 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY MCASKILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.61k | £5.53k | £5.68k | £8.02k | £5.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.72k | £5.59k | £7.61k | £5.93k | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 1995 AND REVISED 21 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENTS OF BRUCE CASTLE MUSEUM AND PARK, LONDON N17 (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'BRUCE CASTLE') IN CO-OPERATION WITH ITS MANAGEMENT AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - HARINGEY/ TOTTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRUCE CASTLE MUSEUM
LORDSHIP LANE
LONDON
N17 8NU
- Phone:
- 02088809998
- Website:
-
friendsofbrucecastle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window