ADULT COMMUNITY EDUCATION (WIGAN) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR STUDENTS ARE WORKING TOWARDS AN ACCREDIATION FROM ASCENTIS, FORMERLY OCNW FOR EMPLOYABILITY AND ASDAN 'INDEPENDENT LIVING SKILLS'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wigan
Governance
- 26 April 2002: Standard registration
- ACE - ADULT COMMUNITY EDUCATION (WIGAN) LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVE HALLIWELL | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anita Wilkinson | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH GENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.76k | £121.86k | £154.43k | £148.58k | £155.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.52k | £121.80k | £181.49k | £157.51k | £170.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £64.77k | £126.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
3. THE AIMS OF ACE ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE NEED OF ADULTS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) ALTERNATIVE COMMUNITY BASED EDUCATION AND TRAINING; B)A COMPREHENSIVE STUDENT CENTRED SERVICE WORKING TO ENABLE STUDENT TO MAKE INFORMED CHOICES ABOUT THEIR LIVES BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO TAKE AN ACTIVE PART IN THEIR OWN COMMUNITY FOR THEIR OWN AND THE COMMUNITY'S BENEFIT; C) A SERVICE THAT NOT ONLY DIRECTLY ADDRESSES A SHORTFALL IN POST 18 EDUCATIONAL PROVISION LOCALLY FOR THE BENEFICIARIES, BUT WHICH ALSO LINKS WITH A VARIETY OF COMMUNITY AGENCIES AND RESOURCES; D) CONTINUOUS IMPROVEMENT IN THE QUALITY OF IT'S SERVICE BY REGULAR EVALUATION AND INVESTMENT IN THE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF STAFF; AND E) A SECURE, WELL- ESTABLISHED SERVICE FOR THE FUTURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACE Adult Community Education Wigan
Queens Hall. 2nd Floor.
46 Market Street.
Wigan
Greater Manchester
WN1 1HX
- Phone:
- 01942829321
- Email:
- eperry@ace-wigan.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window