THE AB TRUST
Charity number: 1091229
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports various Christian mission and church organizations in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Total income: £5,736
Total expenditure: £5,736
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Ealing
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 March 2002: Standard registration
- 23 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £7.21k | £4.80k | £4.80k | £5.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £8.42k | £4.30k | £4.87k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF COVENANT OF 19 MARCH, 1999.
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE SOCIETIES, OBJECTS OR PURPOSES (PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window