Accounts and annual returns OSBASTON CHURCH IN WALES SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1089713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 October 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required