NEUADD CWMLLYNFELL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main activities available to the general public: Fully equipped gymnasium, karate/kick boxing classes, keep fit classes, indoor short mat bowls leage, outdoor bowls league, youth club, children's playschemes (4 weeks per year), mother and toddler group, walking club, computer classes, dance classes, internet cafe and knitting classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £34,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 17 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOIRA THOMAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catrin Gibala | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Evans | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
erica Thomas-Howells | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cerith Close | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bennet | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVIES | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA PHILLIPS | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.07k | £141.00k | £151.00k | £150.00k | £183.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.03k | £80.00k | £165.00k | £165.00k | £182.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.00k | £35.00k | £9.75k | £10.50k | £34.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2024
(These accounts |
14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YSTRADOWEN, CWMLLYNFELL, CEFNBRYNBRAIN, RHOSAMMAN AND RHIWFAWR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE VILLAGE BOUNDARIES (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF ABILITY, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
YSTRADOWEN, CWMLLYNFELL,CEFNBRYNBRAIN, RHOSAMMAN AND RHIWFAWR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE VILLAGE BOUNDARIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEUADD CWMLLYNFELL HALL
GWILYM ROAD
CWMLLYNFELL
SWANSEA
SA9 2GH
- Phone:
- 01639831284
- Email:
- Cwmllynfell.Hall@icloud.com
- Website:
-
cwmllynfell.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window