SHIELD OF FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities involving worshipping of God, spreading the word and preaching the Gospel of Christ and life after life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOALINE OSBOURNE-GORDON | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
NADINE STEPHENS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DWIGHT OMAR AFFON MCCOOK | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
TYRONE SAMUELS | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALFRED SAMUELS | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GWENDOLYN BARWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE MARIE SAMUELS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.07k | £112.44k | £60.60k | £90.51k | £126.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.41k | £53.54k | £49.64k | £50.60k | £74.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEVE APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE 1) TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST 2) TO SPREAD THE WORD OF GOD THROUGH JESUS CHRIST AND HIS TEACHINGS. THE JUSTIFICATION OF SINNER SOLELY BY THE GRACE OF GOD THROUGH FAITH IN CHRIST CRUCIFIED AND RISEN FROM DEAD. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ALL AREA OF LIFE . WE BELIEVE IN OUR GOD ETERNALLY EXISTING IN THREE PERSONS GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT,WE BELIEVE THAT JESUS CHRIST WAS CONCEIVED BY HOLY SPRIT BORN BY THE VIRGIN MARY IS TRUE GOD AND TRUE MARY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE METHODIST CHURCH, RAVENDALE ROAD, HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIELD OF FAITH MINISTRIES
PENRHYN CRESCENT
LONDON
E17 5BH
- Phone:
- 02085032316
- Email:
- alfredsamuels@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window