FRIENDS OF PEATMOOR COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1089837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO HOLD FUND RAISING EVENTS IN ORDER TO SUPPORT PEATMOOR COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,062
Total expenditure: £2,919

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Ann Whittaker Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Samantha Ann Martin Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Lauren Panther Trustee 01 July 2019
SPARKLERS PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
1ST PURTON & LYDIARD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.52k £19 £3.57k £2.66k £3.06k
Total expenditure £3.35k £1.26k £1.04k £2.58k £2.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 October 2024 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 October 2024 609 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PEATMOOR COMMUNITY SCHOOL
PEPPERBOX HILL
PEATMOOR
SWINDON
SN5 5DP
Phone:
01793887473