SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF EPSOM AND EWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities focus on the advancement of the Baha'i Faith and belief in the essential oneness of the world's revealed religions and on Baha'-í ideals of human brotherhood through various means including devotional meetings, children's classes, youth activities, study sessions and interfaith involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Jenkyns | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Dawson | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Muna Linkova | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WAI IN SIN | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR FINCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON MORTIMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIVA SHIRINZADEH-FINCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £668 | £424 | £1.07k | £693 | £926 | |
|
Total expenditure | £716 | £319 | £964 | £697 | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I FAITH, SHARING THE IDEALS OF OUR FELLOW BAHA'IS AND ASSISTING THEIR EFFORTS TO ESTABLISH, UPHOLD AND PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL, EDUCATIONAL AND HUMANITARIAN TEACHINGS OF HUMAN BROTHERHOOD, RADIANT FAITH, EXALTED CHARACTER AND SELFLESS LOVE REVEALED IN THE LIVES AND UTTERANCES OF ALL THE PROPHETS AND MESSENGERS OF GOD, FOUNDERS OF THE WORLD'S REVEALED RELIGIONS, AND GIVEN RENEWED CREATIVE ENERGY AND UNIVERSAL APPLICATION TO THE CONDITIONS OF THIS AGE IN THE LIFE AND UTTERANCES OF BAHA'U'LLAH. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAHA'I FAITH. C) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OF EPSOM AND EWELL AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, WHETHER BAHA'IS OR NOT. D) THE ESTABLISHMENT IN EPSOM AND EWELL, AS SOON AS RESOURCES PERMIT, OF A HOUSE OF WORSHIP AND ITS ASSOCIATED INSTITUTIONS. E) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ASSEMBLY MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
EPSOM AND EWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
- Phone:
- 02075842566
- Email:
- incorps@bahai.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window