THE EPPING FOREST UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1090644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(i) to advance the education of the public and in particular the education of older people no longer in gainful employment in Epping Forest and its surrounding locality. (ii) the provision of facilities for leisure and recreational activities for the members in the interests of their social welfare. In furtherance of these objectives we currently have over 60 groups meeting on a regular basis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £47,045
Total expenditure: £45,155

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EPPING FOREST U3A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Elizabeth Anne Price Chair 07 November 2022
None on record
Nicholas Charles Andrews Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Janine Navarro Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Patricia Ann Lockyer Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Douglas Frederick Pratt Trustee 13 November 2017
THE JIMMY DIXON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen Geoffrey William Baker Trustee 07 November 2016
None on record
Heather Dawn Carnera Trustee 10 November 2014
None on record
Gillian Postlethwaite Trustee 03 November 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £36.78k £8.41k £35.31k £51.78k £47.05k
Total expenditure £32.81k £14.76k £38.82k £49.41k £45.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 27 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 August 2024 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Third Age Trust
Unit 1
52 Lant Street
LONDON
SE1 1RB
Phone:
02084666139
Email:
No information available