Trustees THE EPPING FOREST UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1090644
Up to date (50 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Gunter | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Andrews | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Price | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janine Navarro | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Lockyer | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Frederick Pratt | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Linda Sandra Cohen | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barrie Gunter | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Geoffrey William Baker | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Dawn Carnera | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Postlethwaite | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.