THE ROTARY (DISTRICT 1030) AQUA FILTER CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is developing a new version of the Aqua Filter using the latest technology. The Trust has therefore been dormant during the current period and no donations have been received or machines despatched. Some stock is held awaiting instructions. The charity is now incorporated and it is hoped the new machine will be distributed in the forthcoming period.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ghana
- India
Governance
- 12 March 2002: Standard registration
- 08 February 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 February 2008: Funds transferred to 1119856 ROTARY DISTRICT 1030 AQUA FILTER
- AQUAFILTER TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.48k | £128.91k | £14.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.36k | £78.88k | £74.37k | £453 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 26 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 01 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 02 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 13 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 13 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING WATER PURIFICATION UNITS TO UNDER DEVELOPED AREAS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window