THE FRIENDS OF MELDRETH MANOR AND ORCHARD MANOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help advance the education and training of the children, young people and young adults of Meldreth Manor School and Orchard Manor by providing facilities and equipment for use by them and to provide funds for the services to purchase facilities and equipment for use by them in order to supplement (and not in place of) such provision provided by the State and the Aurora Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 06 February 2002: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF MELDRETH MANOR (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF MELDRETH MANOR (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF MELDRETH MANOR AND ORCHARD MANOR (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Stuart Wilson | Chair |
|
||||||
John Henke | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £909 | £815 | £2.50k | £1.16k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £11.02k | £0 | £0 | £8.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 January 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH NOVEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO HELP ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE SERVICE USERS OF WELDRETH MANOR SCHOOL AND ORCHARD MANOR TRANSITION SERVICE, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR USE BY THE SERVICE USERS AND TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE SERVICES TO PURCHASE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR USE BY THE SERVICE USERS IN ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT (AND NOT IN PLACE OF) SUCH PROVISION PROVIDED BY THE STATE AND BY SCOPE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8a Church Road
Moulton
NEWMARKET
CB8 8SF
- Phone:
- 07890058088
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window