FYLDE T3 LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with youth and helping young people on the Fylde Coast
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 October 2002: Standard registration
- 26 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- T3 (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.69k | £2.12k | £987 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £1.58k | £676 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 03 November 2011 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 20 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 16 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
FYLDE T3 LIMITED AS A CHRISTIAN ORGANISATION, SEEKS TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH INDIVIDUALS, THE CHURCH COMMUNITY, AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH YOUTH, TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE FYLDE COAST, THROUGH EDUCATION, LEISURE AND TRAINING ACTIVITIES, WITHIN OUR CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
FYLDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window