THE CREDIT UNION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education amongst the public in matters pertaining to credit unions. Provide education and training in the knowledge and skills pertinent to the establishment of credit unions. Relieve poverty amongst communities in need by advising communities how to establish credit unions. Relieve poverty by providing grants and other services to credit unions to allow them to extend their services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL STRAND | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Harrison | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Manning MBE | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Norgrove | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Mary Vear | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Pask | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £153.29k | £91.10k | £118.53k | £159.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14m | £1.06m | £83.99k | £149.15k | £154.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.00m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £86.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.14m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7 SEPTEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/04/2015
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO CREDIT UNIONS AND THEIR POTENTIAL IN RELIEVING POVERTY AND NEED, AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS PERTINENT TO THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CREDIT UNIONS; B. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHICH ARE IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF, BY ADVISING NEEDY PERSONS WITHIN THOSE COMMUNITIES HOW TO ESTABLISH AND MANAGE CREDIT UNIONS; C. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES TO CREDIT UNIONS TO ALLOW THEM TO EXTEND THEIR SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Credit Union Foundation
Holyoake House
Hanover Street
MANCHESTER
M60 0AS
- Phone:
- 0161 832 3694
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window