Financial history THE DAVID CHAUDHARY MINISTRIES CHILDRENS HOME TRUST

Charity number: 1092114
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.14k £62.27k £68.53k £60.65k £71.24k
Total expenditure £58.66k £28.01k £28.95k £45.58k £50.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A