Financial history SOUTHWARK HOME CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1095852
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £2.82m £2.53m £2.10m £1.73m £1.34m
Total expenditure £2.82m £2.63m £2.22m £1.73m £1.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.28m £2.09m £1.73m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £30.68k £35.24k £6.40k £112 £0
Income - Other £416.87k £222.01k £670 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.81m £2.62m £2.21m £1.73m £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.02k £7.34k £7.11k £5.88k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0