NORFOLK AND NORWICH HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society organises four flower and produce shows each year, plus on-line and in person lectures and talks on gardening related subjects with a theme of "Gardening for Everyone". We also organise day trips and holidays to gardens in the UK. We have a network of local affiliated societies and help them with publicity and obtaining speakers and judges for their events. Membership is open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 March 2002: Standard registration
- THE NORFOLK AND NORWICH HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY 2002 (Previous name)
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONARD CHARLES FINCH | Chair | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Cranmer | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Edward White | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Loades | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Stelfox | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Jean Goodley | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY WEBDALE | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES GACHES | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.69k | £7.27k | £6.64k | £23.36k | £33.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.89k | £4.35k | £6.11k | £20.58k | £31.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 04/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HORTICULTURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mirtna Cottage
Whinburgh Road
Westfield
DEREHAM
NR19 1QL
- Phone:
- 01362821549
- Email:
- secretary@nnhs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window