Financial history SUFFOLK CHINESE FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.00k £24.50k £32.84k £5.79k £1.90k
Total expenditure £17.48k £9.73k £30.56k £15.80k £11.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £19.34k N/A N/A