Financial history SAINTS FOUNDATION (SFC)

Charity Number: 1090916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.74m £2.32m £2.43m £2.47m £2.77m
Total expenditure £2.56m £2.39m £2.21m £2.42m £2.90m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £9.00k £127.20k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £32.50k £130.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £805.03k £680.81k £803.50k £617.09k £894.15k
Income - Other trading activities £169.18k £121.01k £319.69k £327.05k £346.14k
Income - Charitable activities £1.77m £1.51m £0 £1.51m £1.49m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £13.25k £43.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.31m £7.51k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.15k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.21m £1.93m £2.20m £2.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £149.92k £183.14k £280.12k £216.27k £287.83k
Expenditure - Governance £175.77k £179.80k £20.07k £24.64k £153.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0