THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CORSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funds towards the repair, maintenance and improvement of the church of St Bartholomew, Corsham, and its Churchyard, for the advancement of the Christian religion and the preservation for the benefit of the public of a building of historic and architectural importance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 February 2002: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CORSHAM (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL EDWIN MILLWARD | Chair |
|
||||||
Christine Beryl Carter | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
David John Clowes | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alfred Storey | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Arthur Lambert | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY GORDON GARNETT HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £1.10k | £498 | £539 | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565 | £1.57k | £0 | £0 | £264 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2002 as amended on 24 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF A BUILDING OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE BY ASSISTING IN THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHURCH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, CORSHAM AND ITS CHURCHYARD, IN THE DIOCESE OF BRISTOL.
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, CORSHAM AND ITS CHURCHYARD, IN THE DIOCESE OF BRISTOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Church Street
CORSHAM
SN13 0BY
- Phone:
- 01249701720
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window