MARTIN LUTHER KIRCHE (GERMAN PROTESTANT CHURCH AT MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our area of activity is shown at Trafford because we share the same address as Martin Luther Kirche charity number 1092327 and we are the resource body for this charity. Our classification is mainly indirect, the majority of our grants are channelled directly to 1092327 thus enabling them to provide funds in line with their own classification. (344 boxes).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 05 June 2002: Standard registration
- DEUTSCHE EVANGELISCHE KIRCHE MANCHESTER (Working name)
- GERMAN EVANGELICAL CHURCH AT MANCHESTER (Previous name)
- MARTIN LUTHER KIRCHE (GERMAN PRODESTANT CHURCH AT MANCHESTER) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christa Hunzinger | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christiane Claussnitzer | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Law Dr | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina-Imafidon Vinke | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henning Gieschen | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ulrike RANSON | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH KRAUSS | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNETT MUELLER | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|||||
SABINE FORNACON-WOOD | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE SPIEDEL | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|||||
BAERBEL GRAYSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.31k | £22.89k | £15.62k | £18.28k | £29.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.87k | £18.42k | £22.46k | £24.33k | £18.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1854 AS AMENDED 1949, 1984 AND 1989 AS FURTHER AMENDED 17 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE GERMAN EVANGELICAL CHURCH AT MANCHESTER ( HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CHURCH) SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH CONSONANT WITH DOCTRINES CONTAINED IN THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINES SET OUT IN 2 AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHURCH AT MANCHESTER FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP, AND THE FURTHERANCE OF OTHER CHARITABLE WORK IN CONNECTION THEREWITH. ") THE CHURCH IS A MEMBER OF THE GERMAN SPEAKING EVANGELICAL LUTHERAN SYNOD IN GREAT BRITAIN (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS SYNOD)
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 PARK ROAD
STRETFORD
MANCHESTER
M32 8FE
- Phone:
- 01618651335
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window