THE VERNON ELLIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity primarily supports music organisations in a variety of ways but concentrates on programmes to develop young artists and to use music to help education and well-being. It also supports a number of specific health and educational programmes. It is a small charity and does not invite speculative applications. The Trustees are pro-active in working with organisations they wish to help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 January 2002: Standard registration
- THE ELLIS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE VERNON ELLIS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Bide | Trustee | 04 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MARY ELIZABETH BIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE LOUISE COUSINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR VERNON JAMES ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.95k | £351.21k | £268.34k | £298.65k | £285.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.27k | £168.38k | £211.58k | £449.42k | £475.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT MADE 3RD DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 20TH MARCH 2002 AND 19 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 JULIAN ROAD
ORPINGTON
BR6 6HU
- Phone:
- 07711961788
- Email:
- vernon@vernonellis.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window