Accounts and annual returns THE BANBURY GOLF CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1103213
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 30 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 11 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 04 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 20 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 28 February 2012 On Time