PAPER INDUSTRY TECHNICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dissemination of information and research to benefit the Paper Industry at large, the general public (especially younger people) through training courses, seminars, conferences and journal entitled Paper Technology International.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bury
Governance
- 07 August 2002: Standard registration
- PITA (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Thomas | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anders Astrom | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hutt | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DAVID IVES KLEMZ | Trustee | 16 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr GRAHAM KENNETH MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN WROE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.15k | £135.53k | £108.06k | £133.79k | £264.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.71k | £180.70k | £138.77k | £130.11k | £269.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MANUFACTURE AND USAGE OF PULP PAPER AND RELATED MATERIALS AND GENERALLY TO ENCOURAGE AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PERSONS IN THE PULP PAPER MANUFACTURING AND CONVERTING AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower House
269 Walmersley Road
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 6NX
- Phone:
- 03003020150
- Email:
- info@pita.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window