The Joyce Matthews Ministries

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote understanding of the Christian faith, by interacting with other groups. to promote International understanding and goodwill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
- THE AYO MATTHEWS MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AYO MATTHEWS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALI MAMY KABBA TURAY | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ISA TURAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.48k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £1.50k | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £1.50k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 October 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 March 2022 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 9 OCTOBER, 2001. as amended on 05 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE AND PROCLAIM THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROMOTION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND TO EXTEND THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. (II) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING AND SHELTER.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
41a Manor Road
Westcliff-on-Sea
SS0 7SR
- Phone:
- 01702436638
- Email:
- joyce.matthews1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window