CHRYSALIS PROJECT (SANDWELL) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sandwell
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- 04 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHRYSALIS PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.85k | £54.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.81k | £72.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 25 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 17 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 17 February 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 01 August 2005 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 01 August 2005 | 2 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 JANUARY 2002 AND 20 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
I) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS LIVING OR WORKING IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, AND THEIR CARERS, BY OFFERING SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY AND BY THE PROVISION OF A FORUM THAT BRINGS TOGETHER MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS, CARERS AND WORKERS WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING ISOLATION AND ENABLING SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL MATTERS RELATED TO MENTAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window