FRIENDS OF TARDEBIGGE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Friends of Tardebigge School and include parents, grandparents, uncles and aunties. The group fund raises money by having christmas bazaars, summer fetes, Easter raffles, Promise Auctions, discos and cinema nights. Funds raised are used to fund extra activities and equipment to enhance the education of the children at Tardebigge C of E school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 02 January 2002: Standard registration
- FOTS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Ellie Tarplee | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Marian Pryor | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/09/2019 | 03/09/2020 | 03/09/2021 | 03/09/2022 | 03/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.20k | £4.87k | £1.67k | £3.66k | £4.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51k | £4.32k | £3.58k | £4.56k | £4.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
THE PUPILS OF TARDEBIGGE C.E. AIDED FIRST SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tardebigge C of E School
Church Lane
Tardebigge
Bromsgrove
B60 3AH
- Phone:
- 01527372886
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window