Financial history DOLFOR COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1092270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £14.17k £5.62k £2.66k £5.98k £5.83k
Total expenditure £10.44k £1.93k £8.14k £6.67k £5.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A