THE WARE DRILL HALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of community building to provide hall and meeting room for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN SPENCER WORTHINGTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Clarke | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GRAY | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK POPE | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLLR PHYLLIS ROSE BALLAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALEX YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.39k | £72.70k | £84.66k | £72.66k | £73.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.61k | £76.79k | £72.52k | £94.88k | £101.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £25.00k | £34.87k | £12.56k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2023 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 August 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WARE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WARE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARE DRILL HALL
17 AMWELL END
WARE
SG12 9HP
- Phone:
- 01920487447
- Email:
- ware.dh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window