FOOTSTEPS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Footsteps International aims to put into practice Jesus Christ's command that we should Love God and our neighbour as ourselves. We are committed to helping some of the world's poorest and most needy people. Most of our work is in Kenya where we care for and rehabilitate street children, provide homes for orphaned and abandoned children and support school children in the slums.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 08 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN HENRY PRINT | Chair | 08 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Benjamin James Douglas Gardner | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wendy McMahon | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Francis | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Robinson | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.08k | £325.91k | £256.39k | £369.34k | £313.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.93k | £314.67k | £246.13k | £345.14k | £269.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 LYNWOOD GROVE
ORPINGTON
BR6 0BQ
- Phone:
- 01689828166
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window