WEALDEN CITIZENS ADVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community primarily from the Wealden District Council area by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £322,350 from 39 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 February 2002: Standard registration
- UCKFIELD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Foskett | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Shaw | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Dickinson Ms | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roche | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Murray | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Leonard Harrison | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Rule | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corrinne Askaroff Ms | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bonner | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Watson | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Whensley | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Perry | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.98k | £319.13k | £355.30k | £302.73k | £401.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.46k | £312.11k | £351.92k | £294.50k | £404.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £238.11k | £231.10k | £354.44k | £299.17k | £322.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 14TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY PRIMARILY FROM THE WEALDEN DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA ("THE ARE OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY PRIMARILY FROM THE WEALDEN DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice
Uckfield Library
Library Way
High Street
Uckfield
East Sus
- Phone:
- 01825762807
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window