Financial history FOXHILL FORUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1093385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.61k £196.47k £145.92k £136.19k £114.23k
Total expenditure £111.04k £144.67k £173.06k £162.94k £137.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.83k £40.29k £52.35k N/A