FOXHILL FORUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Forum primarily serves the Foxhill area which is located in Southey Electoral Ward within the City of Sheffield providing Volunteering opportunities alongside a programme of Community Learning, Health and Well Being and Employability Support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 August 2002: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Funds received from 1072100 THE WOLFE ROAD PROJECT LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IAN DAVIDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BARTON MOORE | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ASHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY WOOLHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.61k | £196.47k | £145.92k | £136.19k | £114.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.04k | £144.67k | £173.06k | £162.94k | £137.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.83k | £40.29k | £52.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED INCORPORATED 29 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH EAST SHEFFIELD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT"), THROUGH TRAINING AND RETRAINING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND BY THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE OF SUCH PEOPLE. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH EAST SHEFFIELD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISON OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE FOE COMMUNITY GROUPS REGARDING FUNDING AND OTHER MEANS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 3.3 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOXHILL FORUM
31-33 WOLFE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S6 1BT
- Phone:
- 07912770196
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window