Financial history UNITED MULTICULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1099066
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.33k £47.76k £53.76k £38.06k £33.54k
Total expenditure £41.75k £29.88k £40.52k £40.71k £53.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants £12.10k £19.43k £26.19k £27.72k £25.06k