Winchester Philharmonic Choir

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEEKLY CHORAL SINGING REHEARSALS, AND PROVISION OF TWO PUBLIC CONCERTS PER YEAR. OCCASIONAL EXTRA EVENTS INCLUDING A "COME AND SING"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 January 2003: Standard registration
- WINCHESTER MUSIC CLUB (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
oonagh Thomasina Dockley | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
William Evelyn Chevalier Gubbins | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Mary Whincup | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Ryde-Weller | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Lovelace Rees | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Guy Collins | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gabriele Karin McKeown | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Lowe | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Newman | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Ryde-Weller | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.77k | £124 | £28.37k | £38.36k | £51.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.88k | £1.53k | £35.67k | £39.42k | £39.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2011 as amended on 28 Sep 2018 as amended on 24 Sep 2021 as amended on 03 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE CLUB SHALL EXIST AS AN AMATEUR SOCIETY TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND FOR GENERAL PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Stockers Avenue
WINCHESTER
SO22 5LB
- Phone:
- 01962855553
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window