BRADFORD COMMUNITY ENVIRONMENT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To contribute to the sustainable regeneration of Bradford District, through effective environmental programmes, inspired by community needs. Programmes: Community Urban Design Team Habitat Heroes Gardening for Health Positive Approaches To Health Adventurous Play Experience Scrap Magic! Butterfly Soup/Forest Schools Tackling the Roughs Food Co-ops Wibsey Park Community Garden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £225,028 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 12 September 2002: Standard registration
- 02 August 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- B.C.E.P. (Working name)
- BCEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £578.65k | £628.85k | £632.57k | £489.00k | £422.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £739.17k | £716.76k | £719.75k | £514.00k | £390.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £232.28k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £150 | £225.03k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.86k | £1.98k | £7.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £574.10k | £622.63k | £625.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.69k | £1.24k | £144 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £733.76k | £712.43k | £714.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.41k | £4.33k | £4.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £975 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 21 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 JULY 2002 AND 14 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE SUSTAINABLE REGENERATION OF THE BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT BY: I) THE PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT OR CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. II) THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION. III) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THEY ARE INTENDED. IV) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC WORKS AND SERVICES AND THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. V) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY, COMPETENCE, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. VI) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF LOCAL FOOD PRODUCTION, SOUND NUTRITION, COOKING, AND THE ENVIRONMENT. VII) THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window