Financial history LEARNING DISABILITY ENGLAND

Charity Number: 1092587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £210.84k £416.34k £349.23k £357.14k £297.26k
Total expenditure £209.19k £358.47k £283.82k £373.35k £257.21k
Income from government contracts £14.45k £13.10k £5.00k £16.23k N/A
Income from government grants £13.20k £144.81k £96.35k £100.75k £28.00k