LEARNING DISABILITY ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the company is the provision of information, advice and training to individuals with learning disabilities, their relatives and carers and professionals who work with them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 2002: Standard registration
- HOUSING AND SUPPORT ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- HOUSING OPTIONS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Rebecca Maguire | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marja Kristiina Cooper | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Parmi Dheensa | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Stewart Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hopkins | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tilly | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Walmsley | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Braynion | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.84k | £416.34k | £349.23k | £357.14k | £297.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.19k | £358.47k | £283.82k | £373.35k | £257.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.45k | £13.10k | £5.00k | £16.23k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.20k | £144.81k | £96.35k | £100.75k | £28.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JUN 2016 as amended on 11 May 2017 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY IN RESPECT OF THEIR HOUSING CARE OR SUPPORT NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ANTHONY COLLINS SOLICITORS LLP
134 EDMUND STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B3 2ES
- Phone:
- 03001110444
- Email:
- info@LDEngland.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window