Governing document LEARNING DISABILITY ENGLAND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JUN 2016 as amended on 11 May 2017 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY IN RESPECT OF THEIR HOUSING CARE OR SUPPORT NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.