FAMILY TREE (WIRRAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Tree Wirral provides training, information, support groups, counselling, advocacy, newsletter, library and social events for family members of those experiencing mental ill-health. In addition, members of the charity bring the needs and views of carers to local decision making bodies and the charity seeks to work collaboratively with other agencies, both statutory and voluntary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 05 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faisal Bunni | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robinson | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Lawrence | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TONY HAYDN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.17k | £54.14k | £17.81k | £16.32k | £476 | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.85k | £33.78k | £25.65k | £21.79k | £19.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/01/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN WIRRAL, THE CONDITIONS OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THEIR CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STEIN CENTRE
ST CATHERINES HOSPITAL
DERBY ROAD
BIRKENHEAD
MERSEYSIDE
CH42 0LQ
- Phone:
- 01514888159
- Email:
- tony.lawrence1@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window